IL HB3447 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Tuition Reduction Act. Beginning with the 2017-2018 academic year, requires each public university located in this State to reimburse its full-time resident undergraduate students a portion of the tuition charged in the form of a grant applied directly to a student's financial aid account. Provides that to determine the per-pupil grant amount, the university shall calculate the difference, if any, between the current fiscal year's aggregate appropriations to the university and fiscal year 2015's aggregate appropriations to the university and divide that amount by the number of students enrolled in the previous academic year. Provides that 50% of this calculation then equals the per-pupil grant amount, to be awarded to currently enrolled students to reduce their tuition costs (unless the current fiscal year's aggregate appropriations to the university are equal to or less than fiscal year 2015's aggregate appropriations). Requires each university to annually report updated estimates of the total amount in grants awarded in an academic year to the Governor and the appropriate committees of the General Assembly. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-TUITION REDUCTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-28HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2017-05-28HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-28HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 010-003-000
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2017-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-23HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 015-004-000
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-10HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback