IL HB3106 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Prohibits a former legislator, during the 2-year period immediately after the termination of his or her term of office, from: (1) engaging in lobbying, if he or she accepts compensation specifically attributable to such lobbying; or (2) accepting employment with a lobbying entity. Provides that the restrictions imposed by this amendatory Act do not apply to a former legislator from lobbying without compensation. Contains a penalty provision for violating this lobbying restriction.
Title
ETHICS-LEGISLATOR LOBBYING BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3106&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3106.htm |