IL HB3087 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that in addition to any other sentence that may be imposed for criminal defacement of property, a person convicted of criminal defacement of property (rather than criminal defacement of property that is chargeable as a Class 3 or 4 felony) shall be subject to a mandatory minimum fine of $500 plus the actual costs incurred by the property owner or the unit of government to abate, remediate, repair, or remove the effect of the damage to the property. Provides that to the extent permitted by law, reimbursement for the costs of abatement, remediation, repair, or removal shall be payable to the person who incurred the costs. Provides that if the offense is gang-related, the fine shall be at least $1,000.
Title
CRIM CD-CRIM DEFACEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deborah Mell |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 21-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3087&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3087.htm |