IL HB3068 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0074
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0074
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Solid Waste Planning and Recycling Act. Creates the Statewide Materials Management Advisory Committee. Provides that the Advisory Committee shall: (1) investigate and provide recommendations for expanding waste reduction, recycling, reuse, and composting in Illinois in a manner that protects the environment, as well as public health and safety, and promotes economic development; (2) investigate and provide recommendations for the form and contents of county waste management plans adopted under the Act; and (3) prepare a report as required under other provisions of the amendatory Act. Provides that the Advisory Committee shall be composed of the Director of the Environmental Protection Agency, who shall serve as an ex officio and nonvoting member, and 25 specified voting members appointed by the Director by no later than January 1, 2020. Provides that the initial meeting of the Advisory Committee shall be convened by no later than March 1, 2020, when the voting members shall select co-chairs. Tasks the Agency with providing administrative assistance and technical support. Provides that funding for the Plan and assistance from outside experts shall be obtained from the Solid Waste Management Fund. Provides that the report shall be submitted on or before July 1, 2021. Provides that the report shall include, at a minimum: (1) an estimate of the amount and composition of waste generated annually in Illinois; (2) an estimate of the amount of waste disposed of annually in Illinois; (3) an estimate of the amount of material diverted from landfills annually in Illinois; (4) an analysis of the markets available for materials diverted from Illinois landfills; (5) recommended materials in the municipal waste stream that could be targeted to maximize waste diversion; (6) recommended actions that could be taken to increase landfill diversion rates and the costs associated with those actions; (7) recommended education and public outreach programs that could maximize waste diversion; (8) recommended diversion rates that are achievable by 2025, 2030, and 2035; and (9) a database and map of permitted and nonpermitted facilities, including, but not limited to, landfills, garbage transfer stations, landscape waste transfer stations, construction and demolition debris recycling facilities, recycling facilities, compost sites, and scrap metal recycling facilities. Provides that the report shall also include specified recommendations for waste management plans required under the Act. Repeals the provisions on July 1, 2022. Effective immediately.
Title
SOLID WASTE MGMT-RESOURCE MGMT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0074 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date July 12, 2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 104-006-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 029-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 024-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 016-011-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 20 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 20 | 4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |