IL HB3054 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Expands the list of indicia and equipment that must be removed prior to the sale or transfer of a police vehicle to specify spotlights, push bumpers, sirens, in-car video systems, and vehicle graphics. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD - REMOVING POLICE MARKS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0468 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2013 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2013 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 010-000-000 |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-04-18 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2013-04-18 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-04-18 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2013-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2013-04-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-609 | Amended Code | Citation Text |