IL HB3038 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0073
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0073
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sexual Assault Survivors Emergency Treatment Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health may approve a sexual assault transfer plan for the provision of medical forensic services until January 1, 2022 if: (1) a treatment hospital with approved pediatric transfer has agreed, as part of an areawide treatment plan, to accept sexual assault survivors 13 years of age or older from the proposed transfer hospital, if the treatment hospital with approved pediatric transfer is geographically closer to the transfer hospital than a treatment hospital or another treatment hospital with approved pediatric transfer and such transfer is not unduly burdensome on the sexual assault survivor; and (2) a treatment hospital has agreed, as a part of an areawide treatment plan, to accept sexual assault survivors under 13 years of age from the proposed transfer hospital and transfer to the treatment hospital would not unduly burden the sexual assault survivor. Provides that an areawide treatment plan may include a written agreement with a treatment hospital with approved pediatric transfer that is geographically closer than other hospitals providing medical forensic services to sexual assault survivors 13 years of age or older stating that the treatment hospital with approved pediatric transfer will provide medical services to sexual assault survivors 13 years of age or older who are transferred from the transfer hospital. Provides that if the areawide treatment plan includes a written agreement with a treatment hospital with approved pediatric transfer, it must also include a written agreement with a treatment hospital stating that the treatment hospital will provide medical forensic services to sexual assault survivors under 13 years of age who are transferred from the transfer hospital. Effective immediately.
Title
SEXUAL ASSAULT-TREATMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0073 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date July 12, 2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |