IL HB2996 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0264
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0264
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal of the Illinois Occupational Therapy Practice Act from January 1, 2014 to January 1, 2024. Amends the Illinois Occupational Therapy Practice Act. Makes changes to Section headings and provisions concerning definitions, civil penalties, administration of Act, the Occupational Therapy Board, applications, examinations, licenses, fees, advertising, discipline, injunctions, investigations, hearings, confidentiality, subpoenas, findings and reports of the Board, restoration of licenses, suspensions, penalties, and home rule. Makes other changes. Effective December 31, 2013.
Title
OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY-SUNSET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0264 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date December 31, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-001 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-22 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deborah Mell |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |