IL HB2959 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Park and Museum District Business Enterprise Act. Creates the Park and Museum District Business Enterprise Council for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities comprised of members appointed by the Governor, including individuals representing businesses that are minority-owned or women-owned or owned by persons with disabilities, an individual representing the business community, and individuals representing park districts and museum districts. Provides for an aspirational goal in park districts and museum districts of not less than 30% of the total dollar amount of specified park and museum district contracts to be awarded to businesses owned by minorities, women, and persons with disabilities. Provides, however, that of the total amount of all park and museum district contracts awarded to businesses owned by minorities, women, and persons with disabilities, contracts representing at least 16% shall be awarded to businesses owned by minorities, contracts representing at least 10% shall be awarded to women-owned businesses, and contracts representing at least 3% shall be awarded to businesses owned by persons with disabilities. Provides for duties of the Secretary of the Council and for annual report requirements of the Council. Provides for compliance, exemptions, waivers, and other requirements. Provides that the Department of Central Management Services shall conduct studies that measures the impact of discrimination on minority and women business development in park and museum districts in Illinois. Amends the State Finance Act making conforming changes.
Title
PARK/MUSEUM DISTRICT DIVERSITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancements Committee; 006-004-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancements Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2959&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2959.htm |