IL HB2914 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a municipality may not incur legal expenses in excess of $1,000,000 unless the electors of the municipality approve a greater amount of legal expenses after a referendum after adoption of an ordinance requesting the referendum. Limits home rule powers. Exempts full-time and part-time employees.
Title
MUNI-LEGAL EXPENSES REFERENDUM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |