IL HB2845 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Lowers the age in which a person may apply for a Firearm Owner's Identification Card without parental or legal guardian consent from 21 years of age to 18 years of age. Provides that an applicant who is 18 (rather than 21) years of age or older seeking a religious exemption to the photograph requirement must furnish with the application an approved copy of United States Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service Form 4029.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARM OWNERS ID-18 YEARS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430654Amended CodeCitation Text
430658Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback