IL HB2760 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0448
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0448
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Home Health, Home Services, and Home Nursing Agency Licensing Act. Provides that a physician licensed in another state may oversee or direct the delivery of skilled home care services provided by home health and home nursing agencies licensed in Illinois following care or treatment originally provided to the patient in the state in which the physician is licensed to practice medicine until care is transitioned to a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches in Illinois under certain specified conditions, including: (i) contact between the patient's out-of-state physician and the patient's primary care physician in Illinois, if any; (ii) the initial transition period may not exceed 90 days from the date of the order for skilled home care services; and (iii) a copy of the license of the out-of-state physician must be retained in the patient's chart.
Title
HOME HEALTH-SERVICES-OVERSIGHT
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Sen. Darin LaHood [R] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0448 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2013-04-12 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2013-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |