IL HB2723 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal of the Private Detective, Private Alarm, Private Security, Fingerprint Vendor, and Locksmith Act of 2004 from January 1, 2014 to January 1, 2024. Amends the Private Detective, Private Alarm, Private Security, Fingerprint Vendor, and Locksmith Act of 2004. Makes changes to provisions concerning definitions, legislative intent, issuance of license, unlawful acts, exemptions, qualifications for licensure under the Act, training for private security contractors and employees, uniforms, consumer protection, inspection of facilities, renewal of licenses, employee requirements, employment requirements, requirement for a firearm control card and training, armed proprietary security forces, injunctive relief, discipline, submission to physical or mental examination, complaints, investigations, and hearings, suspension of licenses, restoration of licenses, unlicensed practice, the Private Detective, Private Alarm, Private Security, Fingerprint Vendor, and Locksmith Board, powers and duties of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, and confidentiality. Effective immediately.
Title
PRIVATE DETECTIVES-SUNSET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0253 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-03-14 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |