IL HB2694 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children's Health Insurance Program Act, the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of any of those Acts to the contrary, the Department of Human Services or the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall require an applicant for or recipient of benefits under any of those Acts to supply at least 2 consecutive pay stubs for the purpose of determining the applicant's or recipient's income eligibility for those benefits. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-INCOME VERIFICATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-03 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2009-04-01 Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-04-01 Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-25 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
2009-03-12 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-12 Do Pass / Short Debate Medicaid Reform, Family & Children Services Committee; 006-001-001
2009-03-10 Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 067-040-004
2009-03-10 Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2009-03-03 Assigned to Medicaid Reform, Family & Children Services Committee
2009-02-24 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-02-24 First Reading
2009-02-23 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback