IL HB2625 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0687
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0687
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code and the State Finance Act. Creates the International Brotherhood of Teamsters Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides for the issuance of International Brotherhood of Teamsters license plates. Provides that in addition to the appropriate registration fees, an applicant for the special plate shall be charged a fee of $40 at original issuance and $27 at renewal. Provides that $25 of the additional original issuance fee and the renewal fee shall be deposited into the International Brotherhood of Teamsters Fund. Provides that $15 of the original issuance fee and $2 of the renewal fee shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that, subject to appropriation by the General Assembly and approval by the Secretary of State, the moneys in the International Brotherhood of Teamsters Fund shall be paid as grants to the Teamsters Joint Council 25 Charitable Trust, an independent organization established and registered as a tax exempt entity under Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
VEH CD-TEAMSTERS PLATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 104 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0687 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 104-011-002 | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 104-011-002 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 016-002-001 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-003-001 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-05-22 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 | |
2009-05-21 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-21 | Third Reading - Passed; 050-005-000 | |
2009-05-21 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Koehler | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson | |
2009-05-21 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-19 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation | |
2009-05-01 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-01 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass Transportation; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-24 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Transportation | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-014-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-001-000 | |
2009-03-04 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-04 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker |