IL HB2624 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the introduced bill with the following changes: Provides that the General Assembly (rather than the board of commissioners of the Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago) shall divide the Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago into 9 commissioner districts on or before July 1, 2021 and redistrict after each federal decennial census. Provides that a redistricting plan created shall be drawn to create crossover districts, coalition districts, or influence districts. Makes conforming changes.
Title
MWRD-DISTRICTING & ELECTION
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-27 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-27 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 2605 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2605 | 3.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |