IL HB2623 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Provides that a municipality or other aggregator of electrical load has the authority to require disclosure of the source of the power utilized under the aggregation.
Title
POWER AGENCY-SOURCE OF POWER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0434 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mike Fortner |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mike Fortner |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2013-05-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Energy; 012-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2013 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Energy; 012-000-000 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-04-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2013-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2013-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 018-000-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-92 | Amended Code | Citation Text |