IL HB2570 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions concerning reductions to rates and premium charges for automobile liability insurance for any insured over age 55 upon successful completion of the National Safety Council's Defensive Driving Course or a motor vehicle accident prevention course, provides that the course may be an eLearning course. Provides that any accident prevention course approved by the Secretary of State shall consist of at least 8 hours of classroom or eLearning equivalent instruction (rather than only classroom instruction).
Title
INS-AUTO LIABILITY/ELEARNING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0397 |
2021-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 143.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |