IL HB2541 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-4)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0441
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-4)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0441
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Re-Entering Citizens Civics Education Act. Provides that the Department of Corrections and the Department of Juvenile Justice shall provide a nonpartisan peer-led civics program throughout the correctional institutions of the State to teach civics to soon-to-be released citizens who will be re-entering society. Provides for the curriculum and eligibility for the program. Provides that the program shall be taught by peer educators who are citizens incarcerated in the Department of Corrections and the Department of Juvenile Justice facilities and specially trained by experienced peer educators and established nonpartisan civic organizations. Provides that the nonpartisan civic organizations shall provide adequate training to peer educators on matters including, but not limited to, voting rights, governmental institutions, current affairs, and simulations of voter registration, election, and democratic processes, and shall provide periodic updates to program content and to peer educators. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall adopt rules to carry out the Act within 6 months after the effective date of the Act. Provides that the funding for the voting rights and registration peer education program shall be subject to appropriation by the General Assembly. Contains provisions regarding funding for the program. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
RE-ENTERING CITIZENS CIVIC ED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0441 |
2019-08-21 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 113-001-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Peters |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-009-001 |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |