IL HB2511 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, except provides that for a person 12 years of age or older who is receiving or has received mental health services for an attempted suicide, the person's therapist may share mental health information with family members, friends, or others involved in the recipient's care, if the recipient agrees or does not object, and the information is relevant to the family member, friend, or caregiver's involvement with the recipient's healthcare or the payment for that care (rather than for a person 18 years of age or older who is receiving or has received mental health services for an attempted suicide, the person's therapist shall identify a family member or other person who shall consult with the therapist every 30 days following a suicide attempt for the period of one year that may be extended by the therapist based on need and that the therapist shall be responsible for consulting with the designated person about the progress of the person who is receiving mental health services toward restoration of mental health). Provides that the therapist must: (1) ask the recipient's permission to share relevant information with family members, friends, or other caregivers; (2) tell the recipient he or she plans to discuss the information, (3) give the recipient an opportunity to agree or object; or may infer from the circumstances, using professional judgment, that the recipient does not object, and (4) determine that the sharing of relevant information is in the recipient's best interest. Provides that the family, friends, or caregivers may consult with the therapist every 30 days following a suicide attempt for the period of one year. Provides that the period may be extended by the therapist based on need. Provides that the therapist shall be responsible for consulting with the designated person about the progress of the person who is receiving mental health services toward restoration of mental health. In the amendatory provisions of the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Confidentiality Act, provides that the person designated by a therapist under the Suicide Prevention Act to be consulted on the progress of a recipient of mental health services who has attempted suicide may be consulted only to the extent the information is necessary for the family member, friend, or caregiver's involvement with the recipient's health care or the payment for that care and consistent with the therapist's professional judgment that the consultation is in the recipient's best interest.
Title
SUICIDE PREVENTION-THERAPY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Remains in Mental Health Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Mental Health Committee; 005-010-002 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Mental Health Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 110 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |