IL HB2393 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Deletes the provision that requires each insurer, with respect to the initial renewal, reinstatement, or reissuance of a policy of motor vehicle property damage liability insurance, to provide present policyholders with information regarding availability of uninsured motor vehicle property damage coverage, the premium therefor, and a brief description of the coverage in writing.
Title
INS CD-POLICY INFO-RENEWAL
Sponsors
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Rep. JoAnn Osmond [R] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Sen. Dave Syverson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0242 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 13, 2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-03-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-024-000 |
2013-03-08 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 022-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 143a | Amended Code | Citation Text |