IL HB1615 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning first degree murder. Provides that a person who kills an individual without lawful justification commits first degree murder if he or she acting alone, commits or attempts to commit a forcible felony other than second degree murder and, in the course of and in furtherance of the crime, he or she personally causes the death of an individual. Provides that a person who kills an individual without lawful justification commits first degree murder if he or she, when acting with one or more participants, commits or attempts to commit a forcible felony other than second degree murder, and in the course of and in furtherance of the offense, another participant in the offense causes the death of an individual, and he or she knew that the other participant would engage in conduct that would result in death or great bodily harm. Makes technical changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-FELONY MURDER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2020-02-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-10-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-10-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-09-16HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-09-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-09-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-09-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-08-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-08-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-08-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72059-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback