IL HB1589 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a foreign language endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations may be issued to an applicant who provides satisfactory evidence that he or she meets specified requirements. Provides that the foreign language endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations is valid until June 30 immediately following 5 years of the endorsement being issued and may be renewed. Provides that an individual who holds a valid foreign language endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations may teach a course on the foreign language for which the foreign language endorsement is issued. Provides that an individual who holds a valid foreign language endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations but does not hold a bachelor's degree may substitute teach in foreign language classrooms. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
SCH CD-TEACHER-FOREIGN LANGUAG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Friess |
2023-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000 |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Friess |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |