IL HB1367 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Funeral Directors and Embalmers Licensing Code. In provisions concerning exemptions from continuing education requirements, removes a provision that prevents licensees who have not engaged in the practice of funeral directing and embalming for at least 40 years by January 1, 2016 from receiving an exemption after that date. Effective immediately.
Title
CREMATORY REGULATION-REMAINS
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Sen. Javier Cervantes [D] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Sen. Willie Preston [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0419 |
2023-08-04 | House | Effective Date August 4, 2023 |
2023-08-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2023-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-004-000 |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 18 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 18 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 18 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 18 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |