IL HB1358 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0563
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Provides that the Illinois Certified Shorthand Reporters Act of 1984 is repealed on January 1, 2025 (rather than January 1, 2024). Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act, Election Code, Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, Electric Vehicle Act, Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, Illinois Power Agency Act, Racial Disproportionality in Child Welfare Task Force Act, Crime Reduction Task Force Act, Comprehensive Licensing Information to Minimize Barriers Task Force Act, Money Laundering in Real Estate Task Force Act, Blue-Ribbon Commission on Transportation Infrastructure Funding and Policy Act, Human Trafficking Task Force Act, Kidney Disease Prevention and Education Task Force Act, Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act, Counties Code, Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act, Environmental Protection Act, Illinois Vehicle Code, Common Interest Community Association Act, Condominium Property Act, and the Condominium and Common Interest Community Ombudsperson Act. Extends various repeal dates and other dates. Changes the effective date of Public Act 103-215 to April 30, 2024 (rather than January 1, 2024). Changes the effective date of Public Act 103-542 to July 1, 2024 (rather than January 1, 2024). Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that a prescriber shall not be required to issue prescriptions electronically if the prescription is issued by a licensed veterinarian within 2 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
DOIT-ACCESSIBILITY STANDARDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-09 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-09 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-11-09 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0563 |
2023-11-17 | House | Effective Date November 17, 2023 |
2023-11-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-11-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-11-09 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-11-09 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 102-000-001 |
2023-11-09 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 102-000-001 |
2023-11-09 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2023-11-09 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-11-09 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-11-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2023-11-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2023-11-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-11-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-11-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2023-11-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2023-11-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2023-11-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-002-000 |
2023-11-08 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Glowiak Hilton |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Glowiak Hilton |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 009-000-000 |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 009-000-000 |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 7, 2023 |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-02-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2023-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 587 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |