IL HB1252 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the School Code's construction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-08SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-08SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-11-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-11-08SenateArrive in Senate
2017-11-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-11-08HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 067-049-000
2017-11-02HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-11-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-11-02HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-07-03HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-07-03HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-07-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-07-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-29HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-17HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-17HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-04-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 010-008-000
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-03HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 010-008-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-27HouseRe-assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10551-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback