IL HB1117 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospice Program Licensing Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health's standards for hospices owning or operating hospice residences shall address the number of persons who may be served in a hospice residence, which shall not exceed 24 (rather than 20) persons per location. Provides that the number of licensed hospice residences shall not exceed 16 (rather than 5) located in counties meeting specified population requirements.
Title
HOSPICE PROGRAM LICENSING
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] | Rep. Maura Hirschauer [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] |
Rep. Cyril Nichols [D] | Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0114 |
2023-06-30 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass Health and Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2023-03-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-02-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 60 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |