IL HB1010 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1027
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1027
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
ELECTIONS-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1027 |
2018-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-001-001 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Government Reform; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Government Reform |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-03-16 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |