IL HB0903 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act, the Abused and neglected Child Reporting Act, and the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that the amendatory provisions may be cited as the Family Protection Act of 2009. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall provide case tracking and maintain and provide in its annual report statistical records concerning the number of families subject to safety plans. Provides that "safety plan" means any request made orally or in writing by a designated employee of the Department or a person acting at the Department's behest that a family abide by conditions limiting, restricting, or modifying their usual interaction with their child, including but not limited to a request that a child, parent, or guardian relocate from the family home, that another person reside in the family home, or that a parent or guardian have no unsupervised contact with a child. Sets forth conditions for taking or retaining temporary protective custody of a child. Adds provisions concerning safety plans. Adds provisions concerning review of a Department action restricting a person's access to a family member or requiring a change of living arrangements. Provides for a "no probable cause" hearing under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Makes other changes.
Title
DCFS-CHILD ABUSE-SAFETY PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=903&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0903.htm |