IL HB0873 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Don Harmon
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Don Harmon
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that individual members of the board of trustees of certain villages may not hire a separate attorney using public funds unless the village attorney is disqualified from or recuses himself or herself from representing the member in his or her official capacity. Effective immediately.
Title
MUN CD-VILLAGE ATTORNEY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Sponsor Removed Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-06 | Postponed - Local Government | |
2009-04-29 | Postponed - Local Government | |
2009-04-22 | Held in Local Government | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-001-001 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-03 | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |