IL HB0503 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that under the medical assistance program, beginning January 1, 2009, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services may reimburse a skilled nursing facility, intermediate care facility, or institution for mental diseases providing long-term care services, based upon patient days reported in the facility's most recent cost report, for spending incurred to provide health care benefits to its employees serving the vulnerable populations residing in the facility, in order to attract and retain a qualified and healthy workforce. Provides that subject to available appropriations, the reimbursement shall be made according to certain criteria. Provides that the reimbursement is subject to audit by the Department and shall be reduced or eliminated in the case of any facility that does not honor its commitment to increase spending to improve the health of its employees or that decreases such spending. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
HFS-MEDICAID-NURSING HOMES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2009-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2009-03-05 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-03 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-02-25 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana A. Mendoza | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2009-02-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2009-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2009-02-09 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |