IL HB0471 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Landlord and Tenant Act. Provides that if a landlord enters into a lease with a tenant after receiving notice that a foreclosure proceeding has been initiated against the property, and the tenant later is required to vacate the premises as a result of the foreclosure action, the tenant may recover all of the rent payable from the time the lease is entered into until the tenant vacates the premises.
Title
RENTAL OF FORECLOSURE PROPERTY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-15 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-02-24 | House | To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2017-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-02-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |