IL HB0368 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois State Auditing Act. Provides that federal tax information disclosed under the Act shall only be provided in accordance with federal law and regulation applicable to the safeguarding of federal tax information. Provides that the specified requirements concerning confidentiality of information apply to contractors of the Office of the Auditor General. Removes prior provisions concerning the release of confidential income tax records. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the furnishing upon request of the Auditor General, or his or her authorized agents, for official use of tax returns filed and information related thereto under the Act is deemed to be an official purpose within the Department of Revenue for the purposes of confidentiality and information sharing. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE AUDIT-CONFIDENTIAL INFO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-07-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0061 |
2021-07-09 | House | Effective Date July 9, 2021 |
2021-07-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 5 | 6-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 917 | Amended Code | Citation Text |