IL HB0357 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. For taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2017, reduces the rate of tax to 3% for individuals, trusts, and estates and 4.8% for corporations. Makes corresponding changes concerning the distribution of tax proceeds. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-24 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=357&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0357.htm |