IL HB0284 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the sentence for aggravated criminal sexual assault, which does not otherwise provide for an enhanced penalty, is a Class X felony for which 5 years shall be added to the term of imprisonment imposed by the court. Provides that the sentence for predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, which does not otherwise provide for an enhanced penalty, is a Class X felony with a minimum term of imprisonment of 11 (rather than 6) years.
Title
CRIM CD-SEXUAL ASSAULT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-1.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-1.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-14.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=284&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0284.htm |