IL HB0208 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, in every public school maintaining any of grades kindergarten through 12, there shall be instruction, study, and discussion on the side effects of cannabis when the use of cannabis is not authorized by the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act. Provides that each school board must develop and integrate a test on the use and side effects of cannabis into the instruction and require passage of the test by each student. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-CANNABIS INSTRUCTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-005-000
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-20HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-13.2Amended CodeCitation Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback