IL HB0196 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that eligible child care centers that provide meal services to children in their care shall participate in the federally funded Child and Adult Care Food Program administered by the Illinois State Board of Education.
Title
UNIVERSAL CHILD CARE PROGRAM
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Arthur Turner [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] |
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |