IL HB0164 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Requires all water main-related appurtenances, including fire hydrants and valves, to be included in the Environmental Protection Agency's written approval of a proposed water main installation project.
Title
EPA-WATER MAIN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-03-05 | House | To Workforce Development Subcommittee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |