IL HB0164 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Licensing Act and the University of Illinois Hospital Act. Provides that if a hospital, including the University of Illinois Hospital, makes electronic personal health records available to its patients, then the hospital shall provide information about the availability of those electronic personal health records to every patient prior to the patient's discharge and shall conspicuously post information about the availability of those electronic personal health records. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTRONIC HEALTH RECORDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 330 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 85 | 6.14c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 6.14g | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=164&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0164.htm |