IL HB0161 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0052
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a driver's license or registration and nonresident's operating privilege that is suspended for failure to deposit security shall remain suspended until the statute of limitations has expired and the person seeking reinstatement provides evidence that, during the statute of limitations period, no action for damages arising out of a motor vehicle accident has been properly filed. Provides that the security shall be applicable only to the payment of a judgment, rendered against the person on whose behalf the deposit was made, for damages arising out of the accident in question, in an action at law, begun not later than the later of (i) the expiration of the relevant statute of limitations or (ii) 2 years after the date of any default in any payment under an installment agreement for payment of damages (rather than begun not later than 2 years after the later of (i) the date the driver's license and registration were suspended following the accident or (ii) the date of any default in any payment under an installment agreement for payment of damages). Makes a conforming change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-DEPOSIT OF SECURITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0052
2021-07-09HouseEffective Date January 1, 2022
2021-07-09HouseGovernor Approved
2021-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-27HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
2021-05-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
2021-05-13SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021
2021-05-12SenateDo Pass Transportation; 019-000-000
2021-05-04SenateAssigned to Transportation
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-16HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000
2021-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-03HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62557-211Amended CodeCitation Text
62557-214Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback