IL HB0066 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that if an action is brought for possession of the residential premises of a tenant and the court finds that the tenant is more than 90 days in arrears on his or her rent, the court may order a stay of the enforcement of the judgment for no more than 10 days, or if the court finds that there is good cause for a longer stay, then the court may grant a stay in excess of 10 days, but in that event the court shall require that the tenant pay a pro rata amount of rent under terms established in the stay order.
Title
LANDLORD-EVICT-LIMITED STAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2009-01-08 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. LaShawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=66&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0066.htm |