IL HB0048 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that the definition of "consumer debt" does not include any money due or owing, or alleged to be due or owing, from a natural person for an arrearage of child support. Provides that the definition of "consumer debt judgment" does not include any judgment entered for an arrearage of child support.
Title
CONSUMER DEBT-CHILD SUPPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-12 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-03-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 2-1303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |