ID SJR102 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RIGHTS OF CRIME VICTIMS -- Proposing an amendment to Section 22, Article I, of the Constitution of the State of Idaho regarding rights of crime victims.
Title
Proposing an amendment to Section 22, Article I, of the Constitution of the State of Idaho regarding rights of crime victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read third time in full -- FAILED 23-12-0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |