ID SCR135 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Recommitted to Health & Welfare
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Recommitted to Health & Welfare
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and encouraging companies to avoid substances likely to be harmful and to substitute safer alternatives whenever feasible in household products, especially those likely to be used by pregnant women and children.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and encouraging companies to avoid substances likely to be harmful and to substitute safer alternatives whenever feasible in household products, especially those likely to be used by pregnant women and children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Recommitted to Health & Welfare |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/SCR135.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/SCR135.pdf |