ID SCR111 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CECILIA VIOLETTA LOPEZ -- Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring and congratulating Cecilia Violetta Lopez for her achievements in opera.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and honoring and congratulating Cecilia Violetta Lopez for her achievements in opera.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-28 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-03-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 20, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote -Webb |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/SCR111/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/SCR111.pdf |