ID SCR108 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State on 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State on 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and approving and extending temporary rules reviewed by the Legislature.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and approving and extending temporary rules reviewed by the Legislature.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Secretary of State on 04/08 | |
2011-04-07 | To Secretary of State | |
2011-04-07 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-07 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-07 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-07 | To enrol | |
2011-04-07 | to Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-07 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- 67-0-3 | |
2011-03-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-07 | to St Aff | |
2011-03-07 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-07 | House intro | |
2011-03-04 | to House | |
2011-03-04 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-04 | McKenzie | |
2011-03-04 | voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2011-03-04 | ADOPTED | |
2011-03-04 | 10th Ord | |
2011-03-02 | to 10th Ord | |
2011-03-02 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-01 | to printing | |
2011-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-01 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2011/SCR108.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2011/SCR108.pdf |