ID SCR102 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and providing approval for North Idaho College to enter into an agreement with the Idaho State Building Authority to assist with the development of a building expansion and an athletic facility.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and providing approval for North Idaho College to enter into an agreement with the Idaho State Building Authority to assist with the development of a building expansion and an athletic facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-14 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED 34-0-1 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |