ID S1280 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Read First Time, Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Read First Time, Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Amends and adds to existing law to establish programs for dyslexia.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to establish programs for dyslexia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2022-02-17 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | to House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |