ID S1225 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Session Law Chapter 284 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Session Law Chapter 284 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CIVIL ACTIONS -- Amends existing law to provide for orders renewing judgment, to provide for liens that are continued, to provide for how entry of an order renewing judgment affects a certain date, the priority of collection and the time limitation and to clarify a provision regarding the manner of enforcement of the original judgment.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for orders renewing judgment, to provide for liens that are continued, to provide for how entry of an order renewing judgment affects a certain date, the priority of collection and the time limitation and to clarify a provision regarding the manner of enforcement of the original judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 284 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2018-03-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-19 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2018-02-19 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |