ID S1209 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - 02/02 Read third time in full
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - 02/02 Read third time in full
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION - Amends existing law regarding the general powers of the board of trustees of each community college district.
Title
Amends existing law regarding the general powers of the board of trustees of each community college district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | 02/02 Read third time in full |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2016/S1209.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2016/S1209.pdf |