ID S1158 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Ret'd to Approp
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Ret'd to Approp
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $10,012,500 to the Department of Insurance for fiscal year 2012; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 75.
Title
Appropriates $10,012,500 to the Department of Insurance for fiscal year 2012; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 75.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Ret'd to Approp | |
2011-03-18 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-17 | House intro | |
2011-03-16 | to House | |
2011-03-16 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-16 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 20-15-0 | |
2011-03-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-14 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-14 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-14 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-11 | to Fin | |
2011-03-11 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-10 | to printing | |
2011-03-10 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-10 | Senate intro |